Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 988 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6586 Week
» 29092 Month
» 332282 Year
» 1553847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 6412 on 12/11/1934

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 294
To Service Fri 12/11/1934
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Service Life 29 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 12/11/1934
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 11/08/1956
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/07/1963
83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1963 Yeovil MPD 0-6-0PTs GWR6400/12/30/5 are now allocated and GWR1442/51 have been placed in store from 26th November. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1934 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6412
Built at Swindon Works
   
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6412    

prev prev