Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 69 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4926 Week
» 16631 Month
» 348120 Year
» 424707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6430   03/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1937
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 09/10/1954
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/03/1959
88B Radyr 4w/e 09/09/1961
83D Laira 4w/e 19/05/1962
88H Tondu 4w/e 09/02/1963
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/04/1963
83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 6430
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6430    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Outside the stock shed RO 1/1965 Link

prev prev