Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6504 |
26/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33004 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
26/03/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1960 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/07/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6504 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33004 |
|
|
21/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33004 |
|
|
28/08/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|