Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 406 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 406 Week
» 9148 Month
» 353327 Year
» 864429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6505 09/04/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33005 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 09/04/1960
Withdrawn 25/06/1987
Time in Service 27 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 26/09/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 09/04/1960
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/08/1962
   Withdrawn 25/06/1987


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/04/1960 To Service To service as D6505
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
27/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33005    
25/06/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 33005    
26/09/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev