Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6509 21/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33009 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 21/05/1960
Withdrawn 13/03/1993
Time in Service 32 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 05/04/1997
Cut At MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Works)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 21/05/1960
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn 13/03/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Modification


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1960 To Service To service as D6509
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33009    
13/03/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 33009    
05/04/1997 Scrapped Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Eastleigh Works    

prev prev