Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 17 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 17937 Month
» 349426 Year
» 426013 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6513 25/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33102 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/025/06/1960
33/110/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 25/06/1960
Withdrawn 06/11/1992
Time in Service 32 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 29/10/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 25/06/1960
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 15/05/1967
   Withdrawn 06/11/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1960 To Service To service as D6513
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
15/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33102    
06/11/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 33102    

prev prev