Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14058 Week
» 67074 Month
» 186601 Year
» 3213454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6519 |
27/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33106 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
27/08/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/08/1960 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
05/1967 |
xep |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Push Pull fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6519 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
02/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33106 |
|
|
16/11/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33106 |
|
|
07/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Eastleigh MPD |
|
|