Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6528 29/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33111 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/029/10/1960
33/111/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 29/10/1960
Withdrawn 24/06/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 31/01/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 29/10/1960
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 21/12/1964
   Withdrawn 24/06/1991

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1960 To Service To service as D6528
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
21/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33111    
24/06/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 33111    

prev prev