Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 406 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 406 Week
» 9148 Month
» 353327 Year
» 864429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6530 12/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33018 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 12/11/1960
Withdrawn 01/02/1988
Time in Service 27 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 12/11/1960
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/08/1962
   Withdrawn 01/02/1988

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1960 To Service To service as D6530
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
27/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33018    
01/02/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 33018    

prev prev