Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6532 19/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 33114 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/019/11/1960
33/105/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 19/11/1960
Withdrawn 01/02/1993
Time in Service 32 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 16/08/1996
Cut At MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Yard)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 19/11/1960
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn 01/02/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/11/1960 To Service To service as D6532
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33114    
01/02/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 33114    
16/08/1996 Scrapped Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Eastleigh Yard    

prev prev