Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6545 08/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 33027 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 08/03/1961
Withdrawn 05/07/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 15/09/1992
Cut At Coopers Metals (at Eastleigh MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 08/03/1961
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 21/12/1964
   Withdrawn 05/07/1991


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/03/1961 To Service To service as D6545
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
21/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33027    
05/07/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 33027    
15/09/1992 Scrapped Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Eastleigh MPD    

prev prev