Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6549 01/04/1961
TOPS (Tops) 33031 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 01/04/1961
Withdrawn 06/02/1989
Time in Service 27 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 10/06/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 01/04/1961
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/08/1962
73C Hither Green w/e 29/04/1971
70D Eastleigh 5w/e 30/09/1971
NG   w/e 26/09/1973
EH Eastleigh 6w/e 30/06/1974
   Withdrawn 06/02/1989


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/04/1961 To Service To service as D6549
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
27/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
29/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
30/09/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
26/09/1973 Allocation      
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33031    
30/06/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH)    
06/02/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 33031    
10/06/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev