Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2990 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16396 Week
» 69412 Month
» 188939 Year
» 3215792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6550 |
13/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33032 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
13/04/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/04/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
27/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6550 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
25/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
26/09/1973 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33032 |
|
|
18/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
25/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33032 |
|
|
07/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|