Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6563 22/07/1961
TOPS (Tops) 33045 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Works Number DEL155
To Service 22/07/1961
Withdrawn 30/10/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 06/11/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 22/07/1961
   Withdrawn 30/10/1987


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
22/07/1961 To Service To service as D6563
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number DEL155
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33045    
30/10/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 33045    
06/11/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev