Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6578 25/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 33059 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 25/11/1961
Withdrawn 27/09/1988
Time in Service 26 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 02/07/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 25/11/1961
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green 2w/e 23/09/1968
   Withdrawn 27/09/1988


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1961 To Service To service as D6578
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
23/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33059    
27/09/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 33059    
02/07/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev