Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18129 Week
» 71145 Month
» 190672 Year
» 3217525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6582 |
23/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33062 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
23/12/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1961 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/02/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
12/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6582 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33062 |
|
|
23/09/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33062 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
06/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|