Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1850 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15256 Week
» 68272 Month
» 187799 Year
» 3214652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6585 |
13/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33065 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
13/01/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/01/1962 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6585 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33065 |
|
|
13/02/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33065 |
|
|
14/08/1997 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|