Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1470 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19273 Week
» 72289 Month
» 191816 Year
» 3218669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6590 |
23/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
33205 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (33/3) |
33302 |
08/1988 |
|
TOPS (Revert) |
33205 |
16/10/1988 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
23/02/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1970 |
|
Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/02/1962 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
10/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6590 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hither Green (73C) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
22/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (73D) |
|
|
20/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted
|
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33205 |
|
|
08/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33302 |
|
|
16/10/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33205 |
|
|
27/07/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33205 from Stewarts Lane (SL) |
|
|
08/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Barrow Hill |
|
|