Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 35 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6250 Week
» 17955 Month
» 349444 Year
» 426031 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6593 23/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 33208 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 23/03/1962
Withdrawn 01/02/1997
Time in Service 34 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 23/03/1962
73D St Leonards 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green w/e 20/10/1967
   Withdrawn 01/02/1997

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/03/1962 To Service To service as D6593
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (73D)    
20/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 33208    
01/02/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 33208    

prev prev