Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6597 11/05/1962
TOPS (Tops) 33212 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 11/05/1962
Withdrawn 11/09/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs , 4 mths
Cut Up 10/05/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 11/05/1962
73D St Leonards 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green w/e 20/10/1967
   Withdrawn 11/09/1987


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/05/1962 To Service To service as D6597
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (73D)    
20/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33212    
11/09/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 33212    
10/05/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev