Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4511 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23422 Week
» 88376 Month
» 291040 Year
» 3317893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D66 |
17/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45146 |
22/12/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
17/04/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/04/1987 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
on 05/05/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
17/04/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D66 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
22/12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45146 |
|
|
07/04/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45146 |
|
|
05/05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|