Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19129 Week
» 72145 Month
» 191672 Year
» 3218525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6600 |
26/08/1965 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37300 |
15/11/1973 |
|
TOPS (37/4) |
37429 |
13/03/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 26/08/1965 | 37/4 | 13/03/1986 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3560/D989 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/08/1965 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/2002 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
02/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
26/08/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/08/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
15/11/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6600 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3560 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
15/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37300 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
13/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37429 |
|
|
01/10/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37429 |
|
|
02/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|