Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
TOPS (Renum) 37274 c. 0
TOPS (Renum) 37308 c. 0
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6608 09/11/1965
TOPS (37/0) 37308 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 09/11/1965
Withdrawn 01/01/2005
Time in Service 39 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 09/11/1965
82A Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 31/05/1967
86A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1969
87A Landore w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn 01/01/2005

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37274    
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37308    
09/11/1965 To Service To service as D6608
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
01/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37308    
01/01/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 37308    

prev prev