Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 126 Today
» 1178 Yesterday
» 3449 Week
» 17706 Month
» 245590 Year
» 1467155 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6619 m/e 01/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 244
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal During 03/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1928
88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/09/1956
88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN 65   4w/e 09/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/03/1961 New Brighton-Wrexham Central A mid-morning round trip on 23rd March found few passengers travelling between New Brighton and Bidston-about the same number that used to use the morning trains on the Seacombe branch. The Railways suffer geographically here for while Bidston would make a useful terminus for the service in winter and avoid a lot of duplicated running over electric lines into New Brighton, it would mean a double change for passengers making the complete journey. For they would have to change at Birkenhead North, as well as Bidston, to get to and from New Brighton. In summer, the route provides an ideal route for people from both Chester and Wrexham to get to the seaside and in the reverse direction for people from Wallasey-a town of over 100,000 people of which New Brighton forms only a part-to get into the country.
The Wrexham service has been maintained since the start of 1960 by two car diesel sets and multiples built at Derby, and although there are several stiff gradients, notably that out of Connah's Quay, they seem to have plenty of time in hand, particularly between the more widely spaced stations in the Wirral Peninsula. The journey from Parkgate down to the Dee at Hawarden Bridge and the climb beyond towards Wrexham make this quite a scenic route with wide views in both directions of the Dee Estuary and the Clwydd Hills and of the Cheshire Plain stretching across to Helsby. The intermediate stations with their white-edged platforms are kept neat, although Burton Point which has been closed for some years is looking rather derelict and Hope Exchange High Level has been demolished. This station, which had a Low Level partner on the Chester-Denbigh line, was little used and sometimes passengers had to walk along the line to Hope Village after leaving the L.N.W. station since there was no road within a quarter of a mile.!At Wrexham No. 6619 was shunting in the exchange sidings, while No. 7313 was on a ballast train near Gwersyllt. The old W.M.C.Q. shed at Wrexham is empty, a few wagons being stored there, while the remains of old industrial locomotives exist on the lineside between there and Wrexham Exchange at a small works. At Wrexham Central the scene is constantly changing. A big church with a tall spire which used to dominate the station yard has been demolished and a big brewery is being extended. The old corrugated iron buildings on the station are to be demolished also and the station rebuilt.
SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6619
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6619    

prev prev