Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 451 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6205 Week
» 34163 Month
» 68805 Year
» 1290370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6639 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 35 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 13/08/1955
82C Swindon 4w/e 03/12/1955
88B Radyr 4w/e 05/11/1960
88G Llantrisant 4w/e 25/03/1961
84D Leamington 4w/e 29/06/1963
84D Leamington w/e 20/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 88G Llantrisant 4w/e 25/03/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 03/08/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6639
Built at Swindon Works
   
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (88G)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6639    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev