Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 447 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1832 Week
» 8637 Month
» 115583 Year
» 1337148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6654 m/e 08/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 36 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86J Aberdare 4w/e 30/09/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 6w/e 30/06/1952
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/11/1952
81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1953
81C Southall 4w/e 30/01/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 18/06/1960
88F Treherbert 2w/e 17/11/1962
88C Barry 7w/e 22/06/1964
88E Abercynon 6w/e 12/10/1964
88B Radyr w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 88C Barry 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6654
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6654    

prev prev