Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 255 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 255 Week
» 34830 Month
» 104309 Year
» 1325874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6655 m/e 08/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal During 03/1965
Scrapping During 05/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81C Southall 4w/e 03/10/1953
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
81B Slough 4w/e 03/10/1959
88C Barry 4w/e 26/03/1960
88F Treherbert 4w/e 27/07/1963
87F Llanelly 4w/e 28/09/1963
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6655
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6655    

prev prev