Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4016 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19628 Week
» 118273 Month
» 320937 Year
» 3347790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6657 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1928 |
LMTN |
|
Leamington |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88C |
|
Barry |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
88A |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
88H |
|
Tondu |
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
88B |
|
Radyr |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/06/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
OXY |
Oxley |
4w/e |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
LMTN |
Leamington |
4w/e |
22/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
88H |
Tondu |
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6657 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (88H) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6657 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|