Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 429 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1814 Week
» 8619 Month
» 115565 Year
» 1337130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6664 m/e 09/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 28/02/1951
88A Cardiff Cathays 3w/e 19/05/1951
81C Southall 4w/e 03/10/1953
81B Slough 4w/e 24/04/1954
81F Oxford 4w/e 06/09/1958
81E Didcot 4w/e 23/04/1960
88J Aberdare 4w/e 05/11/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6664
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6664    

prev prev