Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 419 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2865 Week
» 14570 Month
» 346059 Year
» 422646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6695   10/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Service Life 35 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 17/06/1961
88B Radyr 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 88B Radyr 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6695
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6695    

prev prev