Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 15 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6861 Week
» 18408 Month
» 418090 Year
» 494677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6697   10/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1928
Withdrawal During 05/1966
Service Life 37 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 23/04/1960
88B Radyr 4w/e 20/07/1964
2L Leamington w/e 12/09/1964
2D Banbury w/e 19/06/1965
2A Tyseley w/e 23/10/1965
6C Croes Newydd w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 2L Leamington w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 06/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1928 To Service To service as GWR Number 6697
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (2D)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 6697    

prev prev