Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17096 Week
» 82050 Month
» 284714 Year
» 3311567 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6711 |
03/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37011 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
03/03/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
03/08/1987 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs , 5 mths |
Cut Up |
08/1989 |
Cut At |
J Rollason (Wellington) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
03/03/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6711 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
05/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37011 |
|
|
03/08/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37011 |
|
|
08/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J Rollason: Wellington |
|
|