Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 506 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19417 Week
» 84371 Month
» 287035 Year
» 3313888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6715 |
19/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37015 |
20/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37341 |
02/09/1994 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
19/05/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
01/09/1994 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 02/2003 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
19/05/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
dX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6715 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
20/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37015 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/09/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37015 |
|
|
02/09/1994 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37341 |
|
|
02/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|