Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6718 |
05/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37018 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37517 |
14/04/1987 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 05/06/1961 | 37/5 | 14/04/1987 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2881/D597 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
05/06/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/06/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6718 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2881 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37018 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
14/04/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37517 |
|
|