Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 778 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18581 Week
» 71597 Month
» 191124 Year
» 3217977 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6724 |
25/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37024 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37714 |
06/10/1988 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2887/D603 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
25/08/1961 to March (31B) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
25/08/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/10/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/10/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6724 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2887 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
04/10/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37024 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/10/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37714 |
|
|