Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 784 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18587 Week
» 71603 Month
» 191130 Year
» 3217983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6728 |
22/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37028 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37505 |
17/04/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 37 | 22/09/1961 | 37/5 | 17/04/1986 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2891/D607 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
22/09/1961 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2000 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
02/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
05/1976 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6728 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2891 Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37028 |
|
|
01/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
17/02/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
03/03/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
17/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37505 |
|
|
01/12/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37505 |
|
|
02/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|