Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
TOPS (Renum) 37032 c. 0
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6732 09/03/1962
TOPS (37/0) 37032 01/01/1973
TOPS (Renum) 37353 15/06/1988

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 09/03/1962
Withdrawn 04/03/1994
Time in Service 31 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50B Hull Dairycoates (New) 09/03/1962
55C Healey Mills w/e 11/10/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 10/10/1970
51L Thornaby w/e 08/05/1971
52A Gateshead w/e 02/12/1972
TE Thornaby w/e 09/03/1974
   Withdrawn 04/03/1994

Preservation
Preservation Date 04/03/1994
Current Status Operational
Status Date 14/08/2013
Information Bought by the Anglia Type 3 Association directly from Trainload Freight at Doncaster Depot. Currently located on the North Norfolk Railway


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 37032    
09/03/1962 To Service To service as D6732
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)
   
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37032    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
15/06/1988 Renumbered Renumbered to 37353    
04/03/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 37353    

prev prev