Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6734 |
26/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37034 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/7) |
37704 |
20/01/1986 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/05/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6734 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
14/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37034 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
20/01/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37704 |
|
|
01/10/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37704 |
|
|
06/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|