Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6743 |
22/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37043 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37354 |
26/06/1988 |
|
TOPS (37/0 (R)) |
37043 |
24/06/1992 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
22/06/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
31/03/2003 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
13/05/2003 |
Cut At |
Sims Metals (Beeston) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
22/06/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/11/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6743 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
04/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37043 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
26/06/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37354 |
|
|
24/06/1992 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37043 |
|
|
31/03/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37043 |
|
|
13/05/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sims Metals: Beeston |
|
|