Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 524 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18327 Week
» 71343 Month
» 190870 Year
» 3217723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6747 |
20/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37047 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/07/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
31/10/2007 |
Time in Service |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
05/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
20/07/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/02/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/02/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6747 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/02/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37047 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
31/10/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37047 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|