Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 319 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 319 Week
» 34894 Month
» 104373 Year
» 1325938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6751 m/e 06/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1947
Withdrawal During 08/1960
Scrapping During 12/1960 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Radyr 4w/e 19/04/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 19/04/1958
86B Newport Pill 4w/e 01/11/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   m/e 31/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1947 To Service To service as GWR Number 6751
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6751    
12/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev