Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2844 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16250 Week
» 69266 Month
» 188793 Year
» 3215646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6753 |
14/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37053 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (37/3 (2)) |
37344 |
10/11/1994 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
14/09/1962 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1996 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
03/2006 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
14/09/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
29/08/1978 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 04/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
29/08/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6753 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37053 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
29/08/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/11/1994 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37344 |
|
|
01/07/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37344 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|