Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6755 |
21/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37055 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3047/D709 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
21/09/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/2007 |
Time in Service |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
30/04/2008 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
21/09/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
10/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
10/07/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6755 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3047 Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37055 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37055 |
|
|
30/04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|