Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 383 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1768 Week
» 8573 Month
» 115519 Year
» 1337084 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6765   31/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 31/12/1948
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 22/02/1958
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 13/08/1960
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 31/12/1948
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1948 To Service To service as GWR Number 6765
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6765    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev