Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 291 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 291 Week
» 34866 Month
» 104345 Year
» 1325910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6769   31/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 31/01/1949
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88B Cardiff East Dock m/e 16/06/1956
88C Barry 4w/e 22/02/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 09/02/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BRY Barry 06/01/1949
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 6769
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 6769    

prev prev