Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14575 Week
» 67591 Month
» 187118 Year
» 3213971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6771 |
on |
19/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
379 |
To Service |
Mon 19/10/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/03/1958 |
Service Life |
7 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
Information |
On withdrawal the loco was initially moved to the stock shed at Swindon, but then spent about 5 years in use as a stationary boiler at Millbay Docks and Laira shed in Plymouth. |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6771 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
24/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6771 |
|
|
10/05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|