Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 404 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1789 Week
» 8594 Month
» 115540 Year
» 1337105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6774   14/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 14/11/1950 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal During 12/1959
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 9 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 14/11/1950
88B Cardiff East Dock m/e 16/06/1956
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/08/1957
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   14/11/1950
1STALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   m/e 31/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 6774
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 6774    

prev prev