Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 228 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 228 Week
» 34803 Month
» 104282 Year
» 1325847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6775   21/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 21/11/1950 to Barry (88C)
Withdrawal During 08/1960
Scrapping During 03/1961 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 9 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry (New) 21/11/1950
88B Cardiff East Dock m/e 16/06/1956
88C Barry 4w/e 22/03/1958
86B Newport Pill 4w/e 16/07/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   21/11/1950
1STALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 16/07/1960
WDN   m/e 31/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 6775
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Barry (88C)
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6775    
03/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev