Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2882 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16288 Week
» 69304 Month
» 188831 Year
» 3215684 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6776 |
08/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37076 |
31/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (37/5) |
37518 |
1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3068/8322 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
08/10/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
01/12/2000 |
Time in Service |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
08/10/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
dX |
|
by 03/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
dX |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6776 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3068 Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
31/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37076 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
05/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37518 |
|
|
01/12/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37518 |
|
|