Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 721 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7084 Week
» 9666 Month
» 274299 Year
» 1495864 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6778 on 07/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 379
To Service Fri 07/12/1950
Withdrawal Fri 04/05/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 07/12/1950
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/01/1951
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 10/08/1957
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 07/09/1957
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
   Withdrawn 04/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   07/12/1950
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   m/e 31/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1959 Swansea Paxton St. MPD (Upper Bank) The former LNW M.P.D. (Paxton St.) was closed w.e.f. 31st August; freight diagrams and 8F 2-8-0s have been transferred to Llanelly whilst passenger turns and the Fowler 2-6-4Ts transferred to Landore-the remaining shunting turns have been transferred to East Dock, which has taken over Upper Bank and Gurnos, the two ex-M.R. sheds. The present allocation at Upper Bank is 6700/2/14/38/63/6/7/8/73/4/8 and at Gurnos 6712/20/49/70/7. Llandovery is now sub to Llanelly. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/12/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6778
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6778    

prev prev